VA HB2278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of police and court records; absolute pardon. Provides for the automatic expungement of the police and court records relating to a person's conviction if he has been granted an absolute pardon for a crime that he did not commit. Under current law, the person granted the absolute pardon must petition the court for an order of expungement. The bill requires the Secretary of the Commonwealth to forward a copy of any absolute pardon to the circuit court where the person was convicted of the crime for which the absolute pardon was granted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and court records; expungement of records, absolute pardon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2278ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100183D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
22402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback