VA HB2276 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Manufacture, import, sale, transfer, or possession of plastic firearms and unfinished frames or receivers and unserialized firearms; penalties. Creates a Class 5 felony for any person who manufactures, imports, sells, transfers, or possesses any firearm that, after removal of all parts other than a major component, as defined in the bill, is not detectable as a firearm by the types of detection devices, including X-ray machines, commonly used at airports for security screening. The bill updates language regarding the types of detection devices that are used at airports for detecting plastic firearms. Manufacture, import, sale, transfer, or possession of plastic firearms and unfinished frames or receivers and unserialized firearms; penalties. Creates a Class 5 felony for any person who manufactures, imports, sells, transfers, or possesses any firearm that, after removal of all parts other than a major component, as defined in the bill, is not detectable as a firearm by the types of detection devices, including X-ray machines, commonly used at airports for security screening. The bill updates language regarding the types of detection devices that are used at airports for detecting plastic firearms. The bill also creates several Class 1 misdemeanors, which are punishable as a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense, making it unlawful (i) for any person to possess, sell, offer to sell, transfer, purchase, transport, or receive an unfinished frame or receiver or firearm, unless the party possessing or receiving the unfinished frame or receiver or firearm is a federal firearms importer or manufacturer or the unfinished frame or receiver or firearm is imprinted with a serial number issued by a federal firearms importer or manufacturer and (ii) for any person to manufacture, cause to be manufactured, assemble, or cause to be assembled a firearm that is not imprinted with a serial number issued by a federal firearms importer or manufacturer in compliance with all federal laws and regulations regulating the manufacture and import of firearms. The bill creates exceptions for (i) any firearm that has been rendered permanently inoperable, (ii) an antique firearm, or (iii) any firearm or unfinished frame or receiver manufactured before October 22, 1968.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic firearms and unfinished frames, etc.; manufacture, import, sale, transfer, etc., penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2276H1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103385D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103385D-H1
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-18HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 21102945D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.5(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.5:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2276
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2276+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2276H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103385.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2276F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2276F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2276FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2276FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1501V0005+HB2276
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H15V0009+HB2276
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1203+HB2276
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0172+HB2276

Bill Comments

feedback