VA HB2273 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2273

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sales and use tax exemption for data centers. Reduces the job creation requirement to qualify for the sales and use tax exemption for data centers in a distressed locality from 25 to 10 jobs and reduces the required capital investment from $150 million to $70 million for such data centers. The bill also redefines what criteria are used to identify a distressed locality; under the bill, a locality qualifies as distressed if it has an unemployment rate that is greater than the statewide unemployment rate and a poverty rate that exceeds the statewide poverty rate. The bill requires all data centers claiming the exemption to report certain information to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority (the Authority) and the Department of Taxation, in collaboration with the Authority, to aggregate and publish such information biennially.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data centers; sales and use tax exemption, clarifies "distressed locality," report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
2021-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2273ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Agreed To (90-Y 8-N)
2021-02-25HouseConference report agreed to by House (90-Y 8-N)
2021-02-25HouseConference substitute printed 21200579D-H2
2021-02-25 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-19SenateSenators: McPike, Ebbin, Ruff
2021-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-19HouseDelegates: Morefield, Keam, Willett
2021-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-19HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 21200446D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2273S1
2021-02-17SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200247D-S1
2021-02-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200247D-S1
2021-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 9-N)
2021-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2273H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104034D-H1
2021-02-03HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104034D-H1
2021-02-01HouseReported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 21102531D

Same As/Similar To

HB2273 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
SB1423 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
SB1423 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581609.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2273
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2273+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2273H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2273S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2273H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2273ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0367+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200247D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2273AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2273F161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2273FER161+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H10C0043+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1447+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0198+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1001C0011+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0008+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0072HB2273+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0080HB2273+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1746+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0183HB2273+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1997+HB2273
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0525HB2273+HB2273

Bill Comments 750

feedback