VA HB2268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Federal equitable sharing funds received by state agencies. Provides that any federal equitable sharing funds, as defined in the bill, received by a state agency shall be deposited into the general fund. The bill also provides that such funds may be appropriated for any purpose in a manner consistent with federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies; federal equitable sharing funds received by agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102720D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192386.36(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback