VA HB2267 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Local electoral boards and general registrar; disclosure of certain gifts and funding. Requires the disclosure of any gift, including money or services, given by a private individual, corporation, partnership, trust, or other third party to a local electoral board or an office of the general registrar. Such disclosure is required to be made to the clerk of the governing body within five days of receipt and shall include the amount or value of the gift, the date of receipt, and the name and address of the donor. The disclosed information shall be posted on the official website of the county or city. The bill provides that the disclosure requirements do not apply to money or services paid out of the budget of the locality or provided through the general appropriation act established by the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local electoral boards and general registrar; disclosure of certain gifts and funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21101222D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242125(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback