VA HB2266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Retail establishments and restaurants; posting of signs relating to firearms policy. Provides that if a retail establishment or restaurant has a policy that permits the carrying of firearms onto the premises, the proprietor or other person in charge of the retail establishment or restaurant must post in an appropriate place, in a clear, conspicuous, and sufficient manner, a "Firearms Permitted" sign. The bill imposes a civil penalty of not more than $25 for failure to post such signs, to be paid into the Literary Fund.
Title
Retail establishments and restaurants; posting of signs relating to firearms policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103643D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2266 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2266+hil |