VA HB2263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act; breach of procedures. Provides that any evidence gathered through the conduct of an interrogation that violates the provisions of the Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act shall not be admissible in any case against a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act; breach of procedures, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 831 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2263ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2263ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107279D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2263S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107279D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107279D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to General Laws and Technology
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2263H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105723D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105723D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102473D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91302(n/a)See Bill Text
91304(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2263
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2263+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2263H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2263S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2263ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2263ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0831+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0045+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0060+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2078+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0240+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0163+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2263+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2263+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3215+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3385+HB2263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1171HB2263+HB2263

Bill Comments

feedback