VA HB2261 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2261

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Special license plates; member of the Virginia National Guard. Removes the fee for the issuance of special license plates to a member of the Virginia National Guard. Current law provides that such special license plates are issued at half the prescribed cost of state license plates. The bill does not change the fee for personalized special license plates. Special license plates; member of the Virginia National Guard. Removes the fee for the issuance of special license plates to a member of the Virginia National Guard. Current law provides that such special license plates are issued at half the prescribed cost of state license plates. The bill does not change the fee for personalized special license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plates, special; removes fee for issuance to a member of the Virginia National Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 153 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2261ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate (31-Y 6-N 1-A)
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)
2021-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-11SenateReported from Transportation (8-Y 4-N 3-A)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseReported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21102559D

Same As/Similar To

HB2261 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462744(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2261
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2261+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2261ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0153+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2261F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2261FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1903C0095+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19C0025+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0207C0010+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0078+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1367+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1429+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0052+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11V0021+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0032+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0072HB2261+HB2261
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0106HB2261+HB2261

Bill Comments

feedback