VA HB226 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Students who receive home instruction; participation in interscholastic programs. Prohibits public schools from joining an organization governing interscholastic programs that does not deem eligible for participation a student who (i) receives home instruction; (ii) has demonstrated evidence of progress for two consecutive academic years; (iii) is in compliance with immunization requirements; (iv) is entitled to free tuition in a public school; (v) has not reached the age of 19 by August 1 of the current academic year; (vi) is an amateur who receives no compensation but participates solely for the educational, physical, mental, and social benefits of the activity; (vii) complies with all disciplinary rules and is subject to all codes of conduct applicable to all public high school athletes; and (viii) complies with all other rules governing awards, all-star games, maximum consecutive semesters of high school enrollment, parental consents, physical examinations, and transfers applicable to all high school athletes. The bill provides that no local school board is required to establish a policy to permit students who receive home instruction to participate in interscholastic programs. The bill permits reasonable fees to be charged to students who receive home instruction to cover the costs of participation in such interscholastic programs, including the costs of additional insurance, uniforms, and equipment. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students who receive home instruction; participation in interscholastic programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Education
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N)
2020-01-22HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2019-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101749D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2217.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback