VA HB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medically or ethically inappropriate care not required. Establishes a process whereby a physician may cease to provide health care that has been determined to be medically or ethically inappropriate for a patient. This bill is identical to SB 222.
Title
Patients; medically or ethically inappropriate care not required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB226ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101693D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB226E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments from Courts of Justice agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments from Health, Welfare and Institutions agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101693D |