VA HB2257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Hampton Roads Sanitation District. Makes numerous changes to the enabling act for the Hampton Roads Sanitation District related to the addition of Northampton and Accomack Counties to the district, including realignment of the residency requirements for Commissioners. Other changes include (i) defining the term "associated water system" and inserting it as appropriate throughout the bill; (ii) amending certain eminent domain powers related to procurement of lands contiguous to the site of an existing sewage disposal system for construction and operation of an expanded sewage disposal system to meet new regulatory requirements, including nutrient removal technology; (iii) altering authority related to rates; and (iv) making various technical and clarifying updates.
Title
Hampton Roads Sanitation District; changes to the enabling act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101358D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2257 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)