VA HB2257 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Dangerous or vicious dogs; emotional distress damages. Authorizes a general district court to order the owner of a dog that is found to be a dangerous dog to pay restitution for emotional distress damages to any person injured by the animal or whose companion animal was injured or killed by the animal. The bill also authorizes the court to order the owner of a dog that is found to be a vicious dog to pay restitution for emotional distress damages to any person injured by the animal or to the estate of any person killed by the animal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dangerous or vicious dogs; emotional distress damages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103061D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326540(n/a)See Bill Text
326540.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback