VA HB2256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Animal remedies containing Cannabis plant; exemption. Exempts animal remedies that contain any part of the Cannabis plant from certain provisions governing animal remedies, including the requirement that the manufacturer or distributor of an animal remedy obtain a registration for such remedy from the Commissioner of Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals; remedies containing Cannabis plant, exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2256ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-12SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19101875D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2256E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101875D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324901(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2256
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2256+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2256E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2256ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0101V0022+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0049+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2156+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2230+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0060+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB2256+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB2256+HB2256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2834+HB2256

Bill Comments

feedback