VA HB2255 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Elections; public availability of instructions and guidance directed to local elections officials. Requires the instructions and guidance directed or provided by the State Board of Elections or the Department of Elections to electoral boards and registrars regarding the administration or conduct of elections, including the registration of voters, to be made publicly available on the official website of the Department of Elections within 24 hours of being issued to the electoral boards and registrars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local election officials; public availability of instructions and guidance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21102406D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback