VA HB2254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Ice cream trucks; warning lights. Authorizes ice cream trucks to be equipped with amber warning lights for use when the vehicle is stationary or being operated on a highway with a speed limit that does not exceed 25 miles per hour. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Ice cream trucks; warning lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101853D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1088.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |