VA HB2254 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Board; composition; assessment. Alters the member nomination process, tax rate, and other functions of the Tobacco Board (the Board). The bill removes the 90-day deadline for submission of industry nominees for a seat on the Board, as well as the requirement that there be two or more nominations for each seat. The bill removes from the Board the power to appoint a secretary and other employees. Finally, the bill raises the excise tax on tobacco from 20 cents to 40 cents per 100 pounds of tobacco harvested and renames it an assessment; authorizes the Board, at its discretion, to waive interest on the assessment when it is paid late or is left unpaid; and provides criteria for such waiver. This bill is identical to SB 948.
Title
Tobacco Board; composition, increases excise tax on bright flue-cured & type 21 dark-fired tobaccos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 16, 2017 | |
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/9/17 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2254ER) |
2017-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2254H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104064D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104064D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101881D |
Subjects
Agriculture Animal Care and Food
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Taxation
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Taxation
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2407.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 2410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |