VA HB2253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Historically Black Colleges and Universities in the Commonwealth; report. Establishes the 10-member Commission on Historically Black Colleges and Universities in the Commonwealth in the legislative branch to identify and recommend legislative priorities and policies for adoption or examination by the General Assembly and the Governor in order to provide ongoing support in developing and reviewing services and funding related to the five historically black colleges and universities in the Commonwealth, which are Hampton University, Norfolk State University, Virginia State University, Virginia Union University, and Virginia University of Lynchburg. Commission on Historically Black Colleges and Universities in the Commonwealth; report. Establishes the 10-member Commission on Historically Black Colleges and Universities in the Commonwealth in the legislative branch to identify and recommend legislative priorities and policies for adoption or examination by the General Assembly and the Governor in order to provide ongoing support in developing and reviewing services and funding related to the five historically black colleges and universities in the Commonwealth, which are Hampton University, Norfolk State University, Virginia State University, Virginia Union University, and Virginia University of Lynchburg.
Title
Historically Black Colleges & Universities in the Commonwealth, Commission on; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 23102719D-E |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2253E |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102719D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
General Assembly
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports