VA HB2253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonresident concealed handgun permits; time of issuance. Requires the Department of State Police (Department) to issue a concealed handgun permit to a nonresident within 90 days of receipt of the nonresident's completed application unless it determines that he is disqualified. The bill provides that the Department shall certify the nonresident's application as a de facto concealed handgun permit, which is effective for a period of 90 days after issuance, if the Department has not issued the permit or determined that the nonresident is disqualified within that 90-day period. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonresident concealed handgun permits; time of issuance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 50-N) (Y: 49 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: MOTION REJECTED (46-Y 50-N) (Y: 46 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2253ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2019-02-11SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (50-Y 48-N)
2019-01-28HousePassed House (50-Y 48-N)
2019-01-28HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 50-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and defeated by House (49-Y 50-N)
2019-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 19101846D-E
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2253E
2019-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: MOTION REJECTED (46-Y 50-N)
2019-01-25HouseMotion to refer to committee on Appropriations rejected (46-Y 50-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-23HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-18HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (12-Y 8-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101846D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2253
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2253+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2253E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2253ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1501V0008+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0001+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1901+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1925+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1928+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0216+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2253+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0500HB2253+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0504HB2253+HB2253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0505HB2253+HB2253

Bill Comments

feedback