VA HB2250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism. Provides that no newsperson engaged in journalism shall be compelled to testify about, disclose, or produce protected information, as defined in the bill, except when the court finds that (i) the protected information is highly relevant and necessary to the proof of an issue material to an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding; (ii) the protected information is not obtainable from any alternative source; (iii) the Commonwealth or locality exhausted all reasonable methods for obtaining the protected information from all relevant alternative sources, if applicable; and (iv) there is an overriding public interest in the disclosure of the protected information, including preventing harm to or death of a person. The bill further provides that any information obtained in violation of the provisions of the bill shall be inadmissible for any purpose in an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding.
Title
Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101294D |