VA HB2250 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism. Provides that no newsperson engaged in journalism shall be compelled to testify about, disclose, or produce protected information, as defined in the bill, except when the court finds that (i) the protected information is highly relevant and necessary to the proof of an issue material to an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding; (ii) the protected information is not obtainable from any alternative source; (iii) the Commonwealth or locality exhausted all reasonable methods for obtaining the protected information from all relevant alternative sources, if applicable; and (iv) there is an overriding public interest in the disclosure of the protected information, including preventing harm to or death of a person. The bill further provides that any information obtained in violation of the provisions of the bill shall be inadmissible for any purpose in an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101294D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192325(n/a)See Bill Text
801410.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback