VA HB2250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds for institutions of higher education. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $13,637,000 for revenue-producing capital projects at institutions of higher education. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 1369.
Title
Commonwealth of Virginia Institutions of Higher Education Bond Act of 2017; created.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 3/16/17) | |
2017-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB2250ER) |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2250ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17102188D |
Subjects
Bond Issues
Emergency Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation
Emergency Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation