VA HB225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of crimes; finding of guilt required. Requires that any action for the forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of a crime be stayed until the person whose property is the subject of the forfeiture action has been found guilty of the crime authorizing the forfeiture, regardless of whether he has been sentenced. The bill provides that property may be forfeited even though no finding of guilt is made if (i) the forfeiture is ordered by the court pursuant to a plea agreement or (ii) the owner has not submitted a written demand for the return of the property within 21 days from the date the stay terminates.
Title
Forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of crimes; finding of guilt required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1522-Simon) by voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101747D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1522 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1000)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 386.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB225 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB225+hil |