VA HB2249 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2249

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance; filing of information regarding resident agent appointed by nonresident property owner. Prohibits a landlord from requiring a tenant to pay a security deposit, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance prior to the commencement of the tenancy that exceed the amount of two months' periodic rent. The bill permits a landlord, however, to add a monthly amount as additional rent to recover additional costs of such renter's insurance premiums. Finally, the bill requires nonresident property owners to file the name and office address of the agent appointed by such nonresident property owner in the office of the clerk of the State Corporation Commission. Under current law, such information must be filed in the office of the clerk of the court in which deeds are recorded in the county or city in which the property lies. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance; filing of information regarding resident agent appointed by nonresident property owner. Prohibits a landlord from requiring a tenant to pay a security deposit, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance prior to the commencement of the tenancy that exceed the amount of two months' periodic rent. The bill permits a landlord, however, to add a monthly amount as additional rent to recover additional costs of such renter's insurance premiums. Finally, the bill requires nonresident property owners to file the name and office address of the agent appointed by such nonresident property owner in the office of the clerk of the State Corporation Commission. Under current law, such information must be filed in the office of the clerk of the court in which deeds are recorded in the county or city in which the property lies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2249ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200050D-S1 ( 55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N)
2021-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2249S1
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200050D-S1
2021-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200050D-S1
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2249H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103524D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-28HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103524D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102708D

Same As/Similar To

HB2249 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511204(n/a)See Bill Text
5511206(n/a)See Bill Text
5511208(n/a)See Bill Text
5511211(n/a)See Bill Text
5511226(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2249
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2249+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2249H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2249S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2249ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0427+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200050D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2249FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2249FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1102C0049+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0057+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1373+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0159+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0034+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB2249+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0059HB2249+HB2249
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1737+HB2249

Bill Comments 750

feedback