VA HB2249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prior authorization of bonds to fund certain revenue-producing capital projects at institutions of higher learning; Virginia State University. Expands the scope of a revenue-producing capital project at Virginia State University funded by a prior bond authorization. The bill has an emergency clause.
Title
Virginia State University; revenue-producing capital project.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 3/13/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2249ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17102174D |
Subjects
Emergency Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia State University
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia State University