VA HB2248 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Providers of treatment for substance use disorder; use of methadone or opioid replacements; biometric certification. Requires providers of treatment for substance use disorder who administer methadone or opioid replacements as treatments to utilize biometric certification to verify the identity of the clinician and patient. Biometric certification includes iris scans of patients and either iris scans or two-finger fingerprint scans of clinicians. The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish a statewide data repository for the storage of records of every transaction involving the administration of methadone or opioid replacements to a patient, with such records being held for no fewer than 10 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance use disorder; providers of treatment, use of methadone or opioid replacements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102388D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback