VA HB2248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources. This bill is identical to SB 1045.
Title
Capital outlay plan; revises six-year plan for projects.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2248ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference substitute printed 17105792D-H2 |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Hanger, Norment, Saslaw |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Jones, Greason, Torian |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105452D-S1 (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended HB2248S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105452D-S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105452D-S1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2248H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104707D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104707D-H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102172D |