VA HB2247 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Optometry; membership. Adds to the requirements for the five licensed optometrist members of the Board of Optometry that they be individuals who at the time of appointment (i) have met all requirements for practice as an optometrist and are qualified to engage in the full scope of the practice of optometry and (ii) are actively engaged in the delivery of clinical care to patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry, Board of; adds requirements for members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2247ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19101365D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2247E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101365D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413207(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2247
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2247+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2247E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2247ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0340+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0091+HB2247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2319+HB2247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0287+HB2247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2247+HB2247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2247+HB2247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3062+HB2247

Bill Comments

feedback