VA HB2245 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Products containing tetrahydrocannabinol; permits to process and dispense cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil. Clarifies that products containing a concentration of tetrahydrocannabinol that is no greater than that allowed by federal law does not constitute marijuana, as defined in the Code. The bill also increases from one to two the number of pharmaceutical processor permits the Board of Pharmacy may issue or renew for each health service area in any year and allows each pharmaceutical processor to whom a permit has been issued by the Board of Pharmacy to operate up to two off-site dispensing locations for the dispensing of cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to issue additional permits to operate a pharmaceutical processor by September 1, 2019.
Title
Tetrahydrocannabinol; products containing, permits to process and dispense cannabidiol oil.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103205D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 247 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |