VA HB2244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Possession or transportation of firearms following convictions for certain misdemeanor crimes; restoration of rights; penalty. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of assault and battery when the person intentionally selects the person against whom a simple assault is committed because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin from possessing or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides for a process by which a person convicted of such crimes may petition the circuit court for a reinstatement of his right to possess or transport a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; possession or transportation following convictions for certain misdemeanor crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101312D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:6(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback