VA HB2243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Home instruction and private school tax credit. Creates an individual, nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, but before January 1, 2026, for amounts paid by the parent or legal guardian of a child for the child's home instruction expenses or tuition for attending an accredited private school in Virginia. The credit shall equal the lesser of the amount actually paid in the taxable year for such costs or half of the average state standards of quality funding per student per year. The credit may be taken for instruction-related materials, courses, or programs used in home instruction or for private school tuition. The credit is available only to the parents and legal guardians of children who did not attend private school or were not home schooled in the previous year in Virginia. The credit is available for two years per child and can be carried forward for five taxable years.
Title
Home instruction and private schools; creates an individual, nonrefundable income tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102117D |