VA HB2240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victim's right to nondisclosure of certain information; murder. Requires that written consent provided by the victim's next of kin to law enforcement is necessary, if the victim is a minor, before a law-enforcement agency may disclose any information that identifies the victim of a crime that resulted in the victim's death.
Title
Victims of crime; right to nondisclosure of certain information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2240ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (30-Y 10-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2240H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104667D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104667D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102576D |