VA HB224 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public school buses; seat belts. Requires the Board of Education to make regulations to require each new public school bus purchased for the transportation of students to be equipped with a seat belt consisting of a lap belt and shoulder strap or harness in every seat. The bill requires each school board to ensure that no later than July 1, 2036, each school bus that it uses for the transportation of students is equipped with a seat belt in every seat.
Title
School buses, public; requirement of seat belts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101489D |