VA HB2239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting; ballots to be processed before election day and sorted and counted by precinct. Requires certain actions to be taken to process absentee ballots that are returned by mail before election day. The general registrar is required to examine the ballot envelopes to verify completion of the required voter affirmation; mark the pollbook, or the absentee voter applicant list if the pollbook is not available, that the voter has voted; and open the sealed ballot envelopes and insert the ballots in optical scan counting equipment or other secure ballot container without initiating any ballot count totals. Current law requires only that the general registrar undertake at least one such activity before election day. So that ballots can be separated from ballot envelopes and scanned, the bill requires that the office of the general registrar be used as a central absentee voter precinct. The bill requires that absentee ballots processed at any central absentee voter precinct be sorted by the precinct to which the voter who cast the absentee ballot is assigned and that the resulting vote totals from such ballots be reported separately for each voter precinct.
Title
Absentee voting; ballots to be processed before election day and sorted and counted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101712D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |