VA HB2238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Previously unidentified cemeteries. Adds the category of previously unidentified cemetery to the laws allowing for the removal of remains from graveyards or family cemeteries that have been abandoned or are unused and neglected by their owners. The bill includes technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cemeteries; removal of remains, etc., of previously unidentified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 195 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2238ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102311D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2238
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2238+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2238ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0195+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0011+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0036+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1978+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2024+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0141+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2238+HB2238
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2238+HB2238

Bill Comments

feedback