VA HB2238 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts. Permits the parents of certain students with disabilities to apply to their resident school division for a Parental Choice Education Savings Account, to consist of the student's Standards of Quality per pupil funds and to be used for certain expenses of the student, including (i) tuition, fees, or required textbooks at a private elementary or secondary school or preschool that is located in the Commonwealth and does not discriminate on the basis of race, color, or national origin; (ii) educational therapies or services for the student from a practitioner or provider, including paraprofessionals or educational aides; (iii) tutoring services; (iv) curriculum; (v) tuition or fees for a private online learning program; (vi) fees for a nationally standardized norm-referenced achievement test, an Advanced Placement examination, or any examination taken to gain admission to an institution of higher education; or (vii) tuition fees or required textbooks at a public two-year or four-year institution of higher education in the Commonwealth or at an accredited private institution of higher education in the Commonwealth. The bill also contains provisions for the audit and revocation of such accounts.
Title
Virginia Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 59 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 59 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (18-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2238S2 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Martin withdrawn |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105396D-S2 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 15105150D-S1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105396D-S2 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105150D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2238H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Pending question ordered |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 15104891D-H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute from Education rejected 15104525D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104891D-H2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104525D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103179D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 222.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 222.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |