VA HB2236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Hospital Authority. Changes the compensation for members of the Chesapeake Hospital Authority from a maximum of $3,000 per year to $250 per meeting attended and requires the Authority to adopt as part of its bylaws a definition of "compensable meeting" prior to compensating any member. The bill stipulates that no member shall be compensated for participation in a meeting by electronic means when the member is not physically present at the meeting.
Title
Chesapeake Hospital Authority; changes compensation for members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358) | |
2015-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2236ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103188D-E |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2236E |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103188D |