VA HB2234 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2234
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victims of sex trafficking; affirmative defense to prosecution for certain offenses. Provides an affirmative defense to prosecution for prostitution and keeping, residing in, or frequenting a bawdy place if, at the time of the offense leading to such charge, such person was a victim of sex trafficking, as defined in the bill, and (i) was coerced to engage in the offense through the use of force or intimidation or (ii) such offense was committed at the direction of another person other than the individual with whom the person engaged in the acts of prostitution or unlawful sexual intercourse for such money or its equivalent. Victims of sex trafficking; affirmative defense to prosecution for certain offenses. Provides an affirmative defense to prosecution for prostitution and keeping, residing in, or frequenting a bawdy place if, at the time of the offense leading to such charge, such person was a victim of sex trafficking, as defined in the bill, and (i) was coerced to engage in the offense through the use of force or intimidation or (ii) such offense was committed at the direction of another person other than the individual with whom the person engaged in the acts of prostitution or unlawful sexual intercourse for such money or its equivalent.
Title
Victims of sex trafficking; affirmative defense to prosecution for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2234ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, McClellan, Stuart |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | Delegates: Brewer, Convirs-Fowler, Delaney |
2021-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-25 | House | House acceded to request |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 21200467D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2234S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Substitute by Senator agreed to 21200467D-S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21200467D-S1 (Edwards) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2234H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103605D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103605D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101740D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2234 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)