VA HB2233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2233
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Orders of restitution; enforcement. Provides that an order of restitution shall be docketed in the name of the Commonwealth, or a locality if applicable, on behalf of a victim, unless the victim named in the order of restitution requests in writing that the order be docketed in the name of the victim. The bill provides that an order of restitution docketed in the name of the victim shall be enforced by the victim as a civil judgment. The bill also states that the clerk of such court shall record and disburse restitution payments in accordance with orders of restitution or judgments for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality. The bill provides that at any time before a judgment for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality is satisfied, the court shall, at the written request of the victim, order the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim and remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Similarly, the bill provides that if a judge of the district court orders the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim, the district court clerk shall remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Additionally, the bill states that if the victim requests that the order of restitution be docketed in the name of the victim or that a judgment for restitution previously docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality be assigned to the victim, the victim shall provide to the court an address where the defendant can mail payment for the amount due and such address shall not be confidential. Orders of restitution; enforcement. Provides that an order of restitution shall be docketed in the name of the Commonwealth, or a locality if applicable, on behalf of a victim, unless the victim named in the order of restitution requests in writing that the order be docketed in the name of the victim. The bill provides that an order of restitution docketed in the name of the victim shall be enforced by the victim as a civil judgment. The bill also states that the clerk of such court shall record and disburse restitution payments in accordance with orders of restitution or judgments for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality. The bill provides that at any time before a judgment for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality is satisfied, the court shall, at the written request of the victim, order the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim and remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Similarly, the bill provides that if a judge of the district court orders the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim, the district court clerk shall remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Additionally, the bill states that if the victim requests that the order of restitution be docketed in the name of the victim or that a judgment for restitution previously docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality be assigned to the victim, the victim shall provide to the court an address where the defendant can mail payment for the amount due and such address shall not be confidential.
Title
Orders of restitution; docketed on behalf of victim, enforcement.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101548D-E |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2233E |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101548D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |