VA HB2232 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; offenses; intimidation of or interference with authorized representatives of party or candidate; penalty. Makes willfully interfering, or attempting to interfere, with an authorized representative of a party or candidate in his lawful observation of an election a Class 3 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorized representatives of party or candidate; intimidation of or interference, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101714D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2421000.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback