VA HB2231 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Ignition interlock; duration; installation. Provides that the period of time during which a person is (i) prohibited from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system or (ii) required to have an ignition interlock system installed on each motor vehicle owned by or registered to him is calculated from the date the court issues him a restricted license. The bill further provides that this period of time is tolled upon the expiration of the restricted license issued by the court until such time as the person is issued a restricted license by the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ignition interlock system; period of time which person is prohibited to drive, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
2017-03-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2231ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-15SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateRead third time
2017-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2231H1
2017-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104682D-H1
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104682D-H1
2017-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103800D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182270.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182271.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2231
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2231+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2231H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2231ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0499+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0039+HB2231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0083+HB2231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1833+HB2231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0280+HB2231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0527HB2231+HB2231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0549HB2231+HB2231

Bill Comments

feedback