VA HB2231 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Student discipline; modifying long-term suspensions and expulsions. Permits a school board or a committee thereof to reduce the long-term suspension or expulsion of a student or students who received a greater punishment in cases in which the school board or committee determines that (i) two or more students have engaged in closely related offenses arising out of the same incident or circumstances that lead to each student's expulsion or suspension, (ii) the cases resulted in highly disparate disciplinary decisions in which at least one student received a lesser punishment, and (iii) no rational basis exists for the disparate disciplinary decisions. The bill provides that such decisions of the school board or a committee thereof are not subject to judicial review.
Title
Student discipline; modifying long-term suspensions and expulsions.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] |
Del. Mark Berg [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15102706D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2231 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2231+hil |