VA HB2230 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2230

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Supported decision-making agreements; report. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department) to develop and implement a program to educate individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities, their families, and others regarding the availability of supported decision-making agreements, the process by which an individual with an intellectual or developmental disability may enter into a supported decision-making agreement with a supporter, and the rights and responsibilities of principals and supporters who are parties to a supported decision-making agreement, which shall include specific training opportunities, development of model supported decision-making agreements, and development of information about and protocols for preventing, identifying, and addressing abuse and exploitation of individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities who enter into supported decision-making agreements. The bill directs the Department to collect data regarding the utilization of supported decision-making agreements in the Commonwealth and report such information, together with recommendations to enhance the utilization of supported decision-making agreements, annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1. Supported decision-making agreements; report. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department) to develop and implement a program to educate individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities, their families, and others regarding the availability of supported decision-making agreements, the process by which an individual with an intellectual or developmental disability may enter into a supported decision-making agreement with a supporter, and the rights and responsibilities of principals and supporters who are parties to a supported decision-making agreement, which shall include specific training opportunities, development of model supported decision-making agreements, and development of information about and protocols for preventing, identifying, and addressing abuse and exploitation of individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities who enter into supported decision-making agreements. The bill directs the Department to collect data regarding the utilization of supported decision-making agreements in the Commonwealth and report such information, together with recommendations to enhance the utilization of supported decision-making agreements, annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supported decision-making agreements; DBHDS to develop and implement a program, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 232 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2230ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101478D

Same As/Similar To

HB2230 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372314.3(n/a)See Bill Text
6422000(n/a)See Bill Text
6422003(n/a)See Bill Text
6422007(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2230
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2230+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2230ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0232+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2230F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2230FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1203C0003+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0081+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0205C0020+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0094+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1450+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0137+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0034+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0053+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2230+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0136HB2230+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0137HB2230+HB2230
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0138HB2230+HB2230

Bill Comments 750

feedback