VA HB223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance for employees of certain public school Insurance for employees of certain public school foundations. Provides that any locality may provide group life, accident, and health insurance programs for employees of certain public school foundations.
Title
Insurance; locality may provide for employees of certain public school foundations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB223ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Government |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred from Commerce and Energy by voice vote |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100233D |
Same As/Similar To
SB437 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
SB437 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
SB437 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)