VA HB223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; recommendations for improving civic education. Requires the Department of Education to develop and report to the Board of Education, the Governor, and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than July 1, 2021, recommendations for improving civic education for each public elementary and secondary school student in the Commonwealth, including strategies for (i) expanding their level of civic knowledge, (ii) increasing their respect for the political history of the Commonwealth and the United States, (iii) mitigating the politically polarizing effects that the mainstream media can have on such students, and (iv) helping such students become civically and politically engaged in a rational and civil manner.
Title
Education, Department of; recommendations for improving civic education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2019-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103086D |