VA HB223 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; limitations on causes of action. Allows courts to award front pay in addition to back pay as damages for discharging an employee in violation of the Virginia Human Rights Act (§2.2-3900 et seq.). The bill also removes the time period limitation on the amount of back pay awarded, allows courts to increase or diminish the award if the court finds that either party engaged in delay tactics, and increases the cap on attorney fees awarded from 25 percent of the back pay awarded to 40 percent of the back pay and front pay awarded.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; limitations on causes of action.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101370D |