VA HB2227 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2227

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Uniform Statewide Building Code; amendments; energy efficiency and conservation. Directs the Board of Housing and Community Development, upon each publication by the International Code Council of a new version of the International Energy Conservation Code (IECC), to consider adopting amendments to the Uniform Statewide Building Code to address changes in the IECC related to energy efficiency and conservation. Uniform Statewide Building Code; amendments; energy efficiency and conservation. Directs the Board of Housing and Community Development, upon each publication by the International Code Council of a new version of the International Energy Conservation Code (IECC), to consider adopting amendments to the Uniform Statewide Building Code to address changes in the IECC related to energy efficiency and conservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Statewide Building Code; amendments, energy efficiency and conservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2227ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-25SenateRead third time
2021-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N)
2021-02-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-17SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 4-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2227H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104318D-H1
2021-02-04HousePassed by temporarily
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104318D-H1
2021-02-02HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-27HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102540D

Same As/Similar To

HB2227 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2227
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2227+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2227H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2227ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0425+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2227F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2227FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2227FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1102C0053+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1102C0057+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0082+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1490+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0160+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0064+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0097+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0397HB2227+HB2227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0471HB2227+HB2227

Bill Comments 750

feedback