VA HB2227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; hate crimes. Adds the following to the list of crimes that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate: (i) simple assault or assault and battery where the victim was intentionally selected because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin; (ii) entering the property of another for purposes of damaging such property or its contents or interfering with the rights of the owner, user, or occupant where such property was intentionally selected because of the race, religious conviction, color, or national origin of the owner, user, or occupant; and (iii) various offenses that tend to cause violence. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate crimes; adds to list of crimes that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100499D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192215.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback