VA HB2225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Empowerment Scholarship Accounts established. Permits the parents of certain children to apply to the school division in which the child resides for a one-year, renewable Empowerment Scholarship Account that consists of an amount that is equivalent to a certain percentage of all applicable annual Standards of Quality per pupil state funds appropriated for public school purposes and apportioned to the resident school division in which the student resides, including the per pupil share of state sales tax funding in basic aid and any state per pupil share of special education funding for which the student is eligible. The bill permits the parent to use the moneys in such account for certain education-related expenses of the student, including tuition and fees at a private elementary school or secondary school that is located in the Commonwealth. The bill also contains provisions relating to auditing, rescinding, and reviewing expenses made from such accounts.
Title
Empowerment Scholarship Accounts; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101098D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 222.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 222.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |