VA HB2223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2223
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of the Treasury and State Treasurer; bonds. Eliminates language that directs certain officers and board members to procure individual surety bonds mandated by current law when such officers and board members are already covered under bonding provided by the Division of Risk Management. The bill directs such officers and board members to be bonded pursuant to the blanket surety bond plan for state and local employees.
Title
Treasury and State Treasurer, Department of the; surety bonds.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102168D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2223 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
42 | 1 | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 1.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |