VA HB2221 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Personal appearance by two-way electronic video and audio communication; waiver of preliminary hearing. Allows an appearance in court to be made by two-way electronic video and audio communication with the consent of the court and all parties for the purpose of waiver of a preliminary hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal appearance by two-way electronic video/audio communication; waiver of preliminary hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
2023-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-16SenateSigned by President
2023-02-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2221ER)
2023-02-16HouseEnrolled
2023-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13SenateRead third time
2023-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-25HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100030D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1923.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2221
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2221+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2221ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0468+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2221F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2221FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0082+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0026+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1144+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0197+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0418HB2221+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0423HB2221+HB2221

Bill Comments

feedback